CT HB06433 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make technical changes deleting obsolete reports, streamlining the administration of certain programs and making other federally-mandated conforming changes to improve department functionality and customer satisfaction.
Title
An Act Concerning Technical And Other Changes To The Labor Department Statutes.
Sponsors
House Labor and Public Employees Committee | Sen. Mae Flexer [D] | Rep. Louis Esposito [D] | Sen. Joseph Crisco [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 480 PASS (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - House - House Roll Call Vote 168 AS AMENDED (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - House - House Roll Call Vote 168 AS AMENDED (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-06 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-05 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-04 | House | Public Act 13-140 |
2013-05-31 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-05-31 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-31 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-17 | House | File Number 825 |
2013-05-17 | House | Senate Calendar Number 618 |
2013-05-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-15 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-15 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6312 |
2013-03-25 | House | File Number 132 |
2013-03-25 | House | House Calendar Number 114 |
2013-03-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-03-25 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-07 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-02-21 | House | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |