CT HB06419 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-23 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-23 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To extend the foreclosure mediation program for two years to June 30, 2016.
Title
An Act Extending The Foreclosure Mediation Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-23 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-22 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-04-03 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-03-27 | House | File Number 214 |
2013-03-27 | House | House Calendar Number 157 |
2013-03-27 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-03-27 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-21 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-13 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2013-02-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |