CT HB06410 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-17 - File Number 614
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-17 - File Number 614
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a working group to study the issue of online harassment of individuals and make recommendations concerning necessary changes in state law to penalize online harassment of individuals and guidelines for reporting online harassment of municipal and state-elected officials.
Title
An Act Establishing A Working Group Concerning Safe Online Practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-17 | House | File Number 614 |
2023-04-17 | House | House Calendar Number 396 |
2023-04-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-10 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/23 12:00 PM |
2023-03-29 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-27 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-03-16 | House | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2023-03-14 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2023-02-10 | House | Vote to Draft |
2023-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |