CT HB06408 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-22 - Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-22 - Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To clarify the law requiring a property owner to halt the illegal possession of alcohol by minors by restoring language inadvertently deleted in 2012.
Title
An Act Concerning The Possession Of Alcoholic Liquor By Minors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-03-26 | House | File Number 175 |
2013-03-26 | House | House Calendar Number 138 |
2013-03-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-03-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-02-21 | House | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2013-02-14 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |