CT HB06354 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Public Hearing 03/04
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Public Hearing 03/04
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the provisions of public act 18-157 by (1) reducing the amount of state aid provided annually to any municipality that has entered into a debt service assistance agreement with the state by the amount of debt service that the state pays on behalf of such municipality each year; (2) permitting the General Assembly to approve an aggregate level of state aid provided to tier III and IV municipalities; and (3) requiring the approval of the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to appropriations and finance before the state may enter into a debt service assistance agreement with a tier III or IV municipality.
Title
An Act Concerning State Contract Assistance Provided To Certain Municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2019-02-20 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-02-01 | House | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-02-01 | House | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-01-30 | House | Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |