CT HB06352 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-04 - Senate Calendar Number 579
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-04 - Senate Calendar Number 579
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a tire stewardship program in the state.
Title
An Act Concerning Beneficial End Uses In Connecticut For Discarded Tires And Requiring The Establishment Of A Tire Hauler License.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 322 AS AMENDED (Y: 119 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-04 | House | Senate Calendar Number 579 |
2017-06-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-06-03 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2017-06-03 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-03 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8415 |
2017-03-13 | House | File Number 56 |
2017-03-13 | House | House Calendar Number 72 |
2017-03-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-03-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-01 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-02-03 | House | Public Hearing 02/08 |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2017-02-01 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-01-27 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |