CT HB06346 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To allow for uniformity in meeting and reviewing arbitration awards by a municipality's legislative body.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Review Of Municipal Arbitration Awards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 403 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 148 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-24HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-24HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-20HousePublic Act 19-107
2019-06-05HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed
2019-05-20HouseSenate Calendar Number 538
2019-05-20HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-16HouseHouse Passed
2019-04-08HouseFile Number 469
2019-04-08HouseHouse Calendar Number 294
2019-04-08HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-08HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-22HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-21HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-13HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
2019-03-12HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-03-05HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-15HousePublic Hearing 02/21
2019-02-14HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-02-01HouseChange of Reference, Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
2019-02-01HouseChange of Reference, House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
2019-01-30HouseChange of Reference Labor and Public Employees
2019-01-25HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=HB06346&which_year=2019
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-06346-R00-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-06346-R01-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-06346-R02-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/ACT/pa/pdf/2019PA-00107-R00HB-06346-PA.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-06346-R00PD-CV42-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-06346-R00LAB-CV64-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-06346-R00LAB-CV100-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-06346-R00LAB-CV150-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00148-R00HB06346-HV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00403-R00HB06346-SV.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback