CT HB06343 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - File Number 413
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - File Number 413
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Labor Commissioner to conduct a study of gig workers and make recommendations for legislation concerning the classification of such employees.
Title
An Act Concerning A Study Of Gig Workers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | File Number 413 |
2021-04-13 | House | House Calendar Number 314 |
2021-04-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-06 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-29 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2021-03-23 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Vote to Draft |
2021-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2021-02-04 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |