CT HB06343 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-26 - No Action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-26 - No Action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To permit health care providers to enter into cooperative arrangements that would not be subject to certain antitrust laws after approval by the Attorney General, and to require managed care organizations to negotiate in good faith with providers who participate in such arrangements.
Title
An Act Concerning Cooperative Health Care Arrangements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | No Action | |
2011-05-24 | Referred by House to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |
2011-05-17 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-17 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-05-17 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-17 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-16 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-05-10 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-04-27 | File Number 646 | |
2011-04-27 | House Calendar Number 376 | |
2011-04-27 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-27 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-20 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-04-13 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-12 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-02-28 | Public Hearing 03/04 | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |