CT HB06333 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-26 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-26 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize the use of provisional ballots for state and municipal elections and primaries and to use provisional ballots in place of challenged ballots.
Title
An Act Concerning Provisional Ballots For State And Municipal Elections.
Sponsors
Rep. Olivia Floren [R] | Rep. Linda Gentile [D] | House Government Administration and Elections Committee | Rep. Michael Molgano [R] |
Rep. Peter Tercyak [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 81 AS AMENDED (Y: 98 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-26 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |
2011-05-26 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-26 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-25 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-05-19 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | |
2011-05-09 | File Number 778 | |
2011-05-09 | Senate Calendar Number 471 | |
2011-05-09 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-05 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-05-05 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5355 | |
2011-04-07 | File Number 484 | |
2011-04-07 | House Calendar Number 283 | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-07 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-01 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-24 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-23 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-02-10 | Public Hearing 02/14 | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |