CT HB06316 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - File Number 225
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - File Number 225
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Labor Commissioner, the Commissioner of Veterans Affairs and the Commissioner of Consumer Protection, or the commissioners' designees, to jointly evaluate military training applications to the Labor Department's program of apprenticeship training.
Title
An Act Concerning The Evaluation Of Military Training Evaluation Applications Submitted To The Labor Department.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | File Number 225 |
2021-03-31 | House | House Calendar Number 186 |
2021-03-31 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-18 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |
2021-03-08 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Vote to Draft |
2021-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2021-02-04 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |