CT HB06294 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To encourage two or more municipalities to enter into agreements for shared services.
Title
An Act Concerning The Consolidation Of Noneducational Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-02 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-02 | No New File by Committee on Education | |
2011-05-02 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-02 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-29 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-04-21 | Referred by House to Committee on Education | |
2011-04-13 | File Number 518 | |
2011-04-13 | House Calendar Number 311 | |
2011-04-13 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-13 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-07 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-28 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-25 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-02-14 | Public Hearing 02/18 | |
2011-02-04 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |