CT HB06274 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To enact the 2010 amendments to Article 9 of the Uniform Commercial Code concerning secured transactions as proposed by the National Conference of Commissioners on Uniform State Laws and the American Law Institute and recommended by the Connecticut Law Revision Commission.
Title
An Act Concerning Amendments To Article 9 Of The Uniform Commercial Code Concerning Secured Transactions.
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Coleman [D] | Sen. Joseph Crisco [D] | Sen. Paul Doyle [D] | Sen. Edwin Gomes [D] |
Rep. Minnie Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Susan Johnson [D] | House Judiciary Committee | Sen. Anthony Musto [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 424 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 77 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 77 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-08 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-24 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-21 | Public Act 11-108 | |
2011-06-07 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2011-06-07 | Senate Passed | |
2011-05-09 | Senate Calendar Number 474 | |
2011-05-09 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-05 | House Passed | |
2011-04-18 | File Number 543 | |
2011-04-18 | House Calendar Number 335 | |
2011-04-18 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-18 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-11 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-03-31 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-30 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-03-04 | Public Hearing 03/09 | |
2011-02-03 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |