CT HB06239 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Department of Housing to gather data that can be used to determine whether its housing programs affect economic and racial segregation.
Title
An Act Concerning Housing Funding Allocation And Segregation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-04 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-03 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-04-26 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-03-23 | House | File Number 103 |
2021-03-23 | House | House Calendar Number 113 |
2021-03-23 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |
2021-03-08 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Vote to Draft |
2021-02-16 | House | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2021-02-09 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |