CT HB06227 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-05 - Public Hearing 03/09
Pending: Joint Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-05 - Public Hearing 03/09
Pending: Joint Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a task force to identify high-growth, high-demand jobs and analyze the implementation and creation of partnerships that provide apprenticeship opportunities for such jobs.
Title
An Act Establishing A Task Force To Study Work-based Learning Opportunities In Industries With A Hiring Need In The State.
Sponsors
House Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee | Sen. Patricia Miller [D] | Rep. Gary Turco [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2021-02-09 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2021-02-08 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-04 | House | Vote to Draft |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |