CT HB06211 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To allow the offering and tasting of samples of spirits at the places of business where they are produced.
Title
An Act Concerning The Offering And Tasting Of Distilled Spirits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 408 PASS (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House Roll Call Vote 39 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House Roll Call Vote 39 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-04 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-04 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-03 | House | Public Act 13-101 |
2013-05-30 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-05-30 | House | Senate Passed |
2013-04-11 | House | Senate Calendar Number 340 |
2013-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-10 | House | House Passed |
2013-03-26 | House | File Number 171 |
2013-03-26 | House | House Calendar Number 134 |
2013-03-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-03-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-08 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |
2013-03-07 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2013-02-28 | House | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-21 | House | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2013-01-31 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |