CT HB06121 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-6-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-6-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Department of Economic and Community Development to develop a plan to establish a workforce development pipeline for persons with disabilities.
Title
An Act Concerning A Workforce Development Pipeline For Persons With Disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 351 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 50 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 50 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-10 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-10 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-09 | House | Special Act 21-10 |
2021-06-04 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2021-06-04 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-04 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-04-28 | House | File Number 622 |
2021-04-28 | House | Senate Calendar Number 360 |
2021-04-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-26 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-04-26 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7517 |
2021-03-31 | House | File Number 224 |
2021-03-31 | House | House Calendar Number 185 |
2021-03-31 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-18 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |
2021-03-15 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2021-03-04 | House | Vote to Draft |
2021-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/16 |
2021-02-04 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |