CT HB06096 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - File Number 170
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - File Number 170
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Consumer Protection to adopt regulations regarding uniform occupational licensing standards.
Title
An Act Concerning Occupational Licensing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | House | File Number 170 |
2013-03-26 | House | House Calendar Number 133 |
2013-03-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-03-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |
2013-03-06 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-01 | House | Public Hearing 02/07 |
2013-01-31 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |