CT HB06055 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-20 - File Number 933
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-20 - File Number 933
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To make updates to election administration law concerning (1) admission of electors and maintenance of registry lists, (2) training of certain election officials, and (3) residential status of tabulator tenders.
Title
An Act Concerning Certain Updates To Election Administration Laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 146 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | House | File Number 933 |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate Calendar Number 533 |
2019-05-20 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-16 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-16 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8930 |
2019-04-18 | House | File Number 750 |
2019-04-18 | House | House Calendar Number 448 |
2019-04-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2019-03-06 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |