CT HB06052 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-15 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-15 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize the imposition of tolls on the extension of Route 11.
Title
An Act Concerning The Establishment Of Tolls For The Extension Of Route 11.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-15 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-15 | House | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2013-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-04-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2013-04-03 | House | File Number 326 |
2013-04-03 | House | House Calendar Number 226 |
2013-04-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-26 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |
2013-03-13 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-21 | House | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2013-02-04 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |