CT HB06023 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To expand recycling by using asphalt roofing shingles in road paving materials.
Title
An Act Concerning The Use Of Recycled Asphalt Roofing Shingles In Road Paving Materials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 496 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House Roll Call Vote 44 (Y: 121 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House Roll Call Vote 44 (Y: 121 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-11 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-10 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-06 | House | Special Act 13-15 |
2013-06-01 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-06-01 | House | Senate Passed |
2013-04-11 | House | Senate Calendar Number 355 |
2013-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-10 | House | House Passed |
2013-04-03 | House | File Number 322 |
2013-04-03 | House | House Calendar Number 222 |
2013-04-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-26 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |
2013-03-06 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2013-02-25 | House | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-08 | House | Public Hearing 02/13 |
2013-02-04 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |