CT HB05998 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-13 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-13 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a task force to study issues concerning children and youth in rehabilitation.
Title
An Act Establishing A Task Force To Examine Issues Surrounding Children And Youth In Rehabilitation.
Sponsors
Rep. Catherine Abercrombie [D] | Rep. Christopher Lyddy [D] | House Public Health Committee | Rep. Toni Walker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-13 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2011-04-13 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-13 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-13 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-04-06 | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2011-03-31 | File Number 315 | |
2011-03-31 | House Calendar Number 188 | |
2011-03-31 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-03-31 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-25 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-15 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-14 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-03-07 | Public Hearing 03/11 | |
2011-03-04 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | |
2011-03-03 | Drafted by Committee | |
2011-02-14 | Vote to Draft | |
2011-02-03 | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health | |
2011-02-03 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health | |
2011-02-01 | Change of Reference Public Health | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |