CT HB05951 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-18 - Public Hearing 02/23
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-18 - Public Hearing 02/23
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To increase fines for traffic violations occurring on dangerous sections of roads and provide municipalities with additional revenue.
Title
An Act Designating Certain Sections Of Municipal Roads As "accident" Or "hot" Zones.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-18 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation | |
2011-02-15 | Drafted by Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Vote to Draft | |
2011-01-24 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |