CT HB05911 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-11 - File Number 459
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-11 - File Number 459
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To encourage students in teacher preparation programs to become specialized in the teaching of gifted and talented children.
Title
An Act Concerning The Teaching Of Gifted And Talented Children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | House | File Number 459 |
2013-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 295 |
2013-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-28 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-26 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2013-03-13 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2013-03-07 | House | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-08 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2013-01-31 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |