CT HB05910 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To limit the use of perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances in food packaging and firefighting foam.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Limiting The Use Of Perfluoroalkyl Or Polyfluoroalkyl Substances In Class B Firefighting Foam.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-04-17HouseFile Number 677
2019-04-17HouseHouse Calendar Number 413
2019-04-17HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-17HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-03HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-26HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health
2019-03-25HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-03-01HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-07HousePublic Hearing 02/11
2019-02-06HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback