CT HB05901 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-26 - Public Hearing 03/04
Pending: Joint Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-26 - Public Hearing 03/04
Pending: Joint Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require institutions of higher education to provide information to each student concerning his or her total amount of student debt.
Title
An Act Requiring Institutions Of Higher Education To Provide Student Debt Information.
Sponsors
House Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee | Rep. Lucy Dathan [D] | Rep. Gary Turco [D] | Rep. Ronald Napoli [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2021-02-23 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Vote to Draft |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |