CT HB05898 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - File Number 626
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - File Number 626
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement any recommendations of the Commission on Enhancing Agency Outcomes that have not yet been implemented legislatively.
Title
An Act Implementing The Recommendations Of The Commission On Enhancing Agency Outcomes.
Sponsors
House Government Administration and Elections Committee | Sen. Tony Hwang [R] | Sen. Michael McLachlan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | File Number 626 |
2013-04-24 | House | House Calendar Number 415 |
2013-04-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-05 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-04-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2013-04-02 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2013-03-04 | House | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-14 | House | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2013-02-04 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |