CT HB05844 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-8-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-8-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit the overnight tethering of dogs outdoors and to prohibit the tethering of dogs outdoors during certain weather conditions unless shelter is readily accessible to such dog.
Title
An Act Concerning The Overnight Tethering Of Dogs Outdoors And The Tethering Of Dogs Outdoors Under Certain Weather Conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 555 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 238 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 238 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-14 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-13 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-10 | House | Public Act 13-189 |
2013-06-04 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-06-04 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-06-04 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-31 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-31 | House | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2013-05-31 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-31 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-31 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-05-28 | House | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-05-24 | House | File Number 852 |
2013-05-24 | House | Senate Calendar Number 646 |
2013-05-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-22 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-22 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7554 |
2013-04-15 | House | File Number 501 |
2013-04-15 | House | House Calendar Number 318 |
2013-04-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-28 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-27 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2013-02-27 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2013-02-15 | House | Vote to Draft |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |