CT HB05828 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To link employers in the green technology industry with technical education and career schools and institutions of higher education for the purpose of increasing green job opportunities, improving energy efficiency and reducing energy costs.
Title
An Act Establishing A Green Jobs Career Ladder.
Sponsors
House Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee | Rep. Mary Mushinsky [D] | Rep. Joshua Elliott [D] | Rep. Patricia Dillon [D] |
Rep. Terrie Wood [R] | Rep. Joseph Gresko [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-01 | House | File Number 241 |
2019-04-01 | House | House Calendar Number 159 |
2019-04-01 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-01 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2019-03-06 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-01 | House | Public Hearing 02/05 |
2019-01-24 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |