CT HB05802 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-8-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-8-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To adopt certain safety measures recommended by the Thomas Commission in response to the explosion which took place on February 7, 2010, at the Kleen Energy construction site in Middletown, Connecticut.
Title
An Act Adopting Certain Safety Recommendations Of The Thomas Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 455 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 145 AS AMENDED (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 145 AS AMENDED (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-08 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-24 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-20 | Public Act 11-101 | |
2011-06-07 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2011-06-07 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-07 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-05-23 | File Number 832 | |
2011-05-23 | Senate Calendar Number 550 | |
2011-05-23 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-19 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-05-19 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6505 | |
2011-05-10 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-10 | No New File by Committee on Energy and Technology | |
2011-05-10 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-10 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-10 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-05-04 | Referred by House to Committee on Energy and Technology | |
2011-04-27 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-27 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-27 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-27 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-26 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-04-21 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-12 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-12 | No New File by Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |
2011-04-12 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-12 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-12 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-04-06 | Referred by House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |
2011-03-28 | File Number 238 | |
2011-03-28 | House Calendar Number 149 | |
2011-03-28 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-03-28 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-03-10 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-08 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-03-02 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security | |
2011-03-01 | Drafted by Committee | |
2011-02-22 | Vote to Draft | |
2011-02-10 | Public Hearing 02/15 | |
2011-02-01 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |