CT HB05783 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-31 - Senate Calendar Number 630
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-31 - Senate Calendar Number 630
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require written permission to place a donation bin in a public place.
Title
An Act Requiring Written Permission To Place A Donation Bin In A Public Place.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 283 (Y: 131 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-31 | House | Senate Calendar Number 630 |
2015-05-31 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-30 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2015-05-30 | House | House Passed |
2015-04-16 | House | File Number 669 |
2015-04-16 | House | House Calendar Number 431 |
2015-04-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-10 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-27 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |
2015-03-19 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2015-03-13 | House | Vote to Draft |
2015-03-02 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2015-02-11 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2015-02-04 | House | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development |
2015-02-04 | House | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Planning and Development |
2015-01-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |