CT HB05759 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - File Number 297
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - File Number 297
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide businesses with five days' notice before issuing any declaration, proclamation or order that restricts a business's ability to operate or capacity to do business.
Title
An Act Requiring Notice Before The Implementation Of Any Declaration, Proclamation Or Order That Affects Businesses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | File Number 297 |
2021-04-07 | House | House Calendar Number 229 |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-07 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-30 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |
2021-03-15 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Vote to Draft |
2021-02-05 | House | Public Hearing 02/11 |
2021-02-04 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |