CT HB05754 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-15 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-15 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To ensure that Connecticut veterans, members of the armed forces and their dependents and family members are aware of existing mental health services available to them.
Title
An Act Concerning Mental Health Services For Veterans And Members Of The Armed Forces.
Sponsors
House Veterans' Affairs Committee | Rep. Lawrence Cafero [R] | Rep. Vincent Candelora [R] | Rep. Themis Klarides [R] |
Rep. Frank Nicastro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services |
2013-03-14 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services |
2013-03-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Human Services |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |
2013-03-06 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2013-02-22 | House | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-14 | House | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2013-01-24 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |