CT HB05733 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-22 - File Number 585
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-22 - File Number 585
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To restrict access to certain information on death certificates.
Title
An Act Concerning Access To Death Certificates.
Sponsors
House Public Health Committee | Rep. Mitch Bolinsky [R] | Rep. Brenda Kupchick [R] | Sen. John McKinney [R] |
Rep. DebraLee Hovey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | House | File Number 585 |
2013-04-22 | House | House Calendar Number 400 |
2013-04-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/13 10:00 AM |
2013-04-05 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-05 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-04-02 | House | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting |
2013-04-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2013-03-28 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2013-03-11 | House | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-15 | House | Public Hearing 02/20 |
2013-02-04 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |