CT HB05725 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental Protection to submit a report to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to municipalities and the environment concerning the status of collaborative meetings regarding a state-wide strategy to reduce phosphorus loading in inland nontidal waters.
Title
An Act Concerning The State-wide Phosphorous Reduction Plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 467 PASS (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 83 AS AMENDED (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 83 AS AMENDED (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-06 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-05 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-04 | House | Public Act 13-129 |
2013-05-31 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-05-31 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-31 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-14 | House | No New File by Committee on Environment |
2013-05-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-05-08 | House | Referred by Senate to Committee on Environment |
2013-05-03 | House | File Number 702 |
2013-05-03 | House | Senate Calendar Number 514 |
2013-05-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-01 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-01 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6108 |
2013-04-17 | House | File Number 547 |
2013-04-17 | House | House Calendar Number 343 |
2013-04-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-11 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-01 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |
2013-03-27 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-07 | House | Public Hearing 02/13 |
2013-02-01 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |