CT HB05614 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-13-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-13-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require publishers of electronic books to offer e-books for sale to libraries on reasonable terms that would permit libraries to provide their users with access to such books.
Title
An Act Concerning A Study Regarding The Availability Of Electronic Books To Users Of Public Libraries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 422 PASS (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 156 AS AMENDED (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 156 AS AMENDED (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-06 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-04 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-04 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-03 | House | Special Act 13-10 |
2013-05-30 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-05-30 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-30 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-16 | House | File Number 818 |
2013-05-16 | House | Senate Calendar Number 602 |
2013-05-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-14 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-14 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6850 |
2013-03-26 | House | File Number 167 |
2013-03-26 | House | House Calendar Number 130 |
2013-03-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-03-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |
2013-03-06 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-01 | House | Public Hearing 02/07 |
2013-01-31 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |