CT HB05610 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-21 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-21 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the licensing of tax preparers and facilitators and to create a State Board of Tax Practitioners to issue the licenses and enforce the licensing requirements.
Title
An Act Requiring The Licensing Of Commercial Tax Preparers And Facilitators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-04-11 | House | File Number 570 |
2016-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 353 |
2016-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-04 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-03-10 | House | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2016-03-09 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |