CT HB05606 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To adopt the Connecticut Revised Uniform Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act.
Title
An Act Concerning The Connecticut Revised Uniform Fiduciary Access To Digital Assets Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 346 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 350 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 44 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 350 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 44 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-19 | House | Public Act 16-145 |
2016-05-04 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | House | Senate Passed |
2016-04-15 | House | Senate Calendar Number 419 |
2016-04-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-13 | House | House Passed |
2016-04-07 | House | File Number 541 |
2016-04-07 | House | House Calendar Number 343 |
2016-04-07 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-07 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-03-14 | House | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2016-03-08 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |