CT HB05598 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To streamline the current process for the disposition of surplus real property, to allow the Commissioner of Administrative Services to enter into one-year leases without the approval of certain agencies after the governor declares a building-specific emergency, to allow the state to meet in executive session to discuss real estate transactions and to eliminate the requirement that nonclerical employees in the Department of Administrative Services file duplicate statements of financial interest with the department or the State Properties Review Board and the Office of State Ethics.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Administrative Services And The Disposition Of Surplus State Property, Short Term Emergency Leases, The Definition Of Executive Session And Duplicative Statements Of Financial Interest.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 608 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 97 AS AMENDED (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 97 AS AMENDED (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-26 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-26 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-19 | House | Public Act 13-263 |
2013-06-05 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-06-05 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-06-05 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-06 | House | File Number 752 |
2013-05-06 | House | Senate Calendar Number 522 |
2013-05-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-02 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-02 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6384 |
2013-04-18 | House | File Number 568 |
2013-04-18 | House | House Calendar Number 355 |
2013-04-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-12 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-01 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-08 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development |
2013-03-07 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Planning and Development |
2013-03-06 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-05 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-04 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Planning and Development |
2013-01-24 | House | Public Hearing 01/28 |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |