CT HB05588 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To revise statutes concerning the execution, administration and forfeiture of bail bonds and the regulation of surety bail bond agents, and establish a task force to study issues regarding the extradition of fugitives to the state to face criminal proceedings in this state.
Title
An Act Concerning Bail Bonds.
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | Rep. Brandon McGee [D] | Rep. Minnie Gonzalez [D] | Rep. David Labriola [R] |
Sen. Anthony Musto [D] | Sen. Joseph Crisco [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 429 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 213 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 213 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Public Act 14-184 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-02 | Senate | File Number 748 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 551 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2014-05-01 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-01 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4848 |
2014-04-16 | House | File Number 597 |
2014-04-16 | House | House Calendar Number 389 |
2014-04-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-10 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/14 5:00 PM |
2014-04-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-02 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-03-20 | House | Public Hearing 03/24 |
2014-03-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |