CT HB05555 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To include in the list of towns that may receive a Youth Violence Initiative grant the town of Waterbury.
Title
An Act Concerning The Youth Violence Initiative.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 376 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 209 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 209 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Special Act 18-20 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 508 |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | House Passed |
2018-04-16 | House | File Number 506 |
2018-04-16 | House | House Calendar Number 348 |
2018-04-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-09 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/18 10:00 AM |
2018-04-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-04 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-19 | House | Public Hearing 03/23 |
2018-03-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |