CT HB05555 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To restore funding for the public, educational and governmental programming and education technology investment account.
Title
An Act Appropriating Funds For The Public, Educational And Governmental Programming And Education Technology Investment Account.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-03-30 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-03-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-25 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-24 | House | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations |
2015-03-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |
2015-03-18 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Vote to Draft |
2015-02-13 | House | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2015-02-05 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |