CT HB05552 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - File Number 862
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - File Number 862
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To create a task force to study issues related to the volunteer police auxiliary force and to direct the Commissioner of Emergency Services and Public Protection to recruit and train members of the volunteer auxiliary force pursuant to the task force's recommendations.
Title
An Act Concerning The Volunteer Police Auxiliary Force.
Sponsors
House Public Safety and Security Committee | Rep. Patrick Boyd [D] | Rep. Rick Hayes [R] | Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D] |
Rep. Hilda Santiago [D] | Rep. Carol Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 68 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | File Number 862 |
2019-05-09 | House | Senate Calendar Number 474 |
2019-05-09 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-07 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-07 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8031 |
2019-04-04 | House | File Number 392 |
2019-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 246 |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2019-03-05 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-08 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-02-07 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |