CT HB05552 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-05 - Senate Calendar Number 576
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-05 - Senate Calendar Number 576
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To reclassify a slate committee as a committee rather than a political committee, to require slate committees to be treated as candidate committees and to make conforming and technical changes.
Title
An Act Concerning Slate Committees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 252 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Senate Calendar Number 576 |
2014-05-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-05-05 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2014-05-05 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-05 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5140 |
2014-04-10 | House | File Number 505 |
2014-04-10 | House | House Calendar Number 298 |
2014-04-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-04 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-28 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-24 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-03-13 | House | Public Hearing 03/17 |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |