CT HB05542 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-29 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-29 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require homeowners to prominently display the street number assigned to their home.
Title
An Act Requiring The Display Of House Numbers.
Sponsors
House Public Safety and Security Committee | Rep. Louis Esposito [D] | Rep. Victor Cuevas [D] | Rep. Thomas Vicino [D] |
Sen. Joseph Crisco [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-29 | House | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development |
2013-04-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-29 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-29 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-04-23 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development |
2013-04-08 | House | File Number 396 |
2013-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 264 |
2013-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-08 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2013-03-07 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2013-02-28 | House | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-01 | House | Public Hearing 02/07 |
2013-01-31 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |