CT HB05535 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To provide the General Assembly with a timely and accurate accounting of the state's cash balance.
Title
An Act Concerning A Monthly Report From The State Treasurer Regarding The State's Cash Balance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 333 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-05-18 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2010-05-13 | Public Act 10-95 | |
2010-05-04 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Passed | |
2010-04-22 | Senate Calendar Number 451 | |
2010-04-22 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-20 | On Consent Calendar | |
2010-04-20 | House Passed | |
2010-04-12 | File Number 463 | |
2010-04-12 | House Calendar Number 272 | |
2010-04-12 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-12 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-05 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/10 10:00 AM | |
2010-03-26 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-25 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-03-18 | Public Hearing 03/22 | |
2010-03-17 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |