CT HB05530 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-6-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-02 - File Number 878
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-02 - File Number 878
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow students to conscientiously object to performing animal dissections in the classroom.
Title
An Act Concerning Dissection Choice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 222 AS AMENDED (Y: 135 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | File Number 878 | |
2011-06-02 | Senate Calendar Number 618 | |
2011-06-02 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-06-01 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | |
2011-06-01 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-01 | Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule B 7290 | |
2011-06-01 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6629 | |
2011-04-04 | File Number 347 | |
2011-04-04 | House Calendar Number 204 | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-04 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-28 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-03-18 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-17 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-03-10 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Education | |
2011-03-09 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Education | |
2011-03-08 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-04 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-03 | Joint Favorable ED | |
2011-02-18 | Public Hearing 02/22 | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children | |
2011-02-15 | Drafted by Committee | |
2011-02-10 | Vote to Draft | |
2011-02-09 | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Children | |
2011-02-09 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Children | |
2011-02-07 | Change of Reference Children | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |