CT HB05526 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - File Number 503
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - File Number 503
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) implement federal court rulings regarding independent expenditure political committees, (2) increase disclosure of independent expenditures and prohibit such expenditures by foreign-influenced entities, (3) reveal persons behind political committees and contributors to such committees, (4) require online platforms to disclose purchasers of political ads, and (5) increase transparency with respect to moneys paid to consultants.
Title
An Act Concerning Dark Money And Disclosure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | File Number 503 |
2018-04-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-16 | House | House Calendar Number 352 |
2018-04-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-09 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/18 10:00 AM |
2018-03-28 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-28 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-15 | House | Public Hearing 03/19 |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |