CT HB05523 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - File Number 455
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - File Number 455
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To permit a candidate, in addition to the treasurer of such candidate's candidate committee, to be able to deposit contributions in such committee's depository account.
Title
An Act Concerning Deposits Of Contributions In Candidate Committees' Depository Accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-23 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | File Number 455 |
2018-04-12 | House | House Calendar Number 327 |
2018-04-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-06 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-23 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-15 | House | Public Hearing 03/19 |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |