CT HB05509 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - File Number 566
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - File Number 566
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish minimum staffing levels of electric service lineworkers for electric distribution companies.
Title
An Act Requiring A Study Regarding Electric Distribution Companies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | House | File Number 566 |
2016-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 349 |
2016-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-04 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/10 |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |